skip to content

Biondi, Dax James

CPSO#: 96176

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thamesview Centre for Family Med
465 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1C5
Phone: (519) 352-3210
Fax: (519) 352-2176 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

110 Sandys St
Chatham ON  N7L 4X3
Canada
Phone: (519) 351-1330
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

80 Grand Ave W
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Canada
Phone: 519-437-6050
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Biondi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Biondi ( CPSO# 96176 )

Business Address:
Thamesview Centre for Family Medicine
465 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1C5
Phone Number: (519) 352-3210

Business Address:
110 Sandy Street
Chatham ON  N7L 4X3

Business Address:
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:15 Oct 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAX JAMES BIONDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIONDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2013