skip to content

Bin Hasan, Saadoun Ali Hussein Hasan

CPSO#: 97202

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 06 Jan 2012 to 04 Feb 2012
EL - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017