skip to content

Bilgi, Chandrakant Laxman

CPSO#: 29647

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jun 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Karnatak University Dharwar, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Occupational Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 1998