skip to content

Bilbily, Alexander Husam Janan

CPSO#: 101019

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
263 McCaul St
4th Floor
Department of Medical Imaging
Toronto ON  M5T 1W7
Phone: 416 978 6801 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nicole Bilbily Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. BilBily ( CPSO# 101019)
Dr. N. Bilbily ( CPSO# 75491 )

Business Address:
857 Milner Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 5N6
Phone Number: (416) 287-3611


Corporation Name: Alexander Bilbily Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. BilBily ( CPSO# 101019)

Business Address:
Suite 3007
825 Church Street
Toronto ON  M4W 3Z4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER HUSAM JANAN BILBILY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BILBILY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 7 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2018