skip to content

Pardis, Bijan

CPSO#: 68742

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 14 Apr 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Persian

Education:University of Brussels, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
SUITE 204
8108 YONGE STREET
Thornhill ON  L4J 1W4
Phone: (905) 709-9955
Fax: (905) 709-4138 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

4972 DUNDAS STREET WEST
Etobicoke ON  M9A 1B7
Canada
Phone: 4162367924
Fax: 4162367926
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

348 LAKESHORE RD E
UNIT 1
Mississauga ON  L4G 1H5
Canada
Phone: (905) 891-2345
Fax: 905 891 8780
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Pardis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Pardis ( CPSO# 68742 )

Business Address:
1-348 Lakeshore Road East
Mississauga ON  L5G 1H5
Phone Number: (905) 891-2345

Business Address:
4972 Dundas Street West
Etobicoke ON  M9A 1B7
Phone Number: (416) 236-7924

Business Address:
204 - 8108 Yonge Street
Vaughan ON  L4J 1W4
Phone Number: (905) 709-9955

Business Address:
Basement Floor
199 Church Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1Y7
Phone Number: (416) 247-7777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
CF - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1997
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 14 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 25 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 28 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 07 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 04 Aug 2018

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Pardis’ professional misconduct and incompetence have been referred to what is now called the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that Dr. Pardis is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients. In addition, it is alleged Dr. Pardis failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession at addiction treatment clinics, including the administration and management of, and infection prevention and control standards at such clinics. It is also alleged that Dr. Pardis engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct at addiction treatment clinics, including: the administration and management of the clinics and hiring, compensation, and management/ supervision of staff; infection prevention and control; protection and maintenance of patient confidentiality; ensuring the professionalism of clinic staff; his relationship with a pharmacy adjoining his clinic; and/or maintaining appropriate boundaries with patients, staff, and/or service providers. Dr. Pardis is further alleged to have engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct with reference to interfering with a witness in a College investigation and failing to comply with provisions of his undertaking to the College dated March 8, 2017. A conflict of interest is alleged in Dr. Pardis’ relationship with a pharmacy adjoining his clinic, and in failing to comply with requirements regarding patient notification of his proprietary interest in the pharmacy.


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Hearing Dates: November 17, 2021 & December 6, 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 04 Aug 2018 Active
             (1 of 4)
            Effective  August  4,  2018, at 12:01 a.m., Dr. Bijan Pardis is restricted from
            prescribing and from authorizing  any  refills  or  renewals  of  or release of
            prescriptions for methadone. 

            (2 of 4)
            As  from  12:01  a.m., July 7, 2018, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints  and
            Reports Committee  of  the  College  of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the
            following terms, conditions and limitations  are  imposed on the certificate of
            registration held by Dr. Bijan Pardis:

            i.    Dr. Pardis shall not engage in patient encounters  at which he prescribes
                  methadone via telemedicine;

            ii.   Dr. Pardis shall not prescribe methadone, authorize  refill or renewal of
                  a methadone prescription or authorize release of a methadone prescription
                  unless he does so in conjunction with a corresponding  in-person  patient
                  encounter;  

            iii.  Dr.  Pardis  shall only begin prescribing methadone for a patient if  Dr.
                  Pardis has documented  that  he  has  verified  that the patient has been
                  prescribed methadone to date;

            iv.   Dr.  Pardis  shall  engage  an independent Practice Monitor  at  his  own
                  expense, who is a regulated health  professional approved by the College,
                  and who:

                  a.    shall attend unannounced at least  three  (3)  times  per  month to
                        inspect at any of Dr. Pardis' practice locations; 
                  
                  b.    shall  be  permitted  during  their attendances to interview staff,
                        colleagues, patients, and any other  individuals they deem relevant
                        to their inquiries;
                  
                  c.    shall  be  permitted  during  their  attendances   to   review  any
                        documentation  at the practice location that they deem relevant  to
                        their inquiries,  including  records, policies, procedures, and the
                        Prescribing Log (as described  below), and to request and obtain in
                        a timely manner any such materials  under the control of Dr. Pardis
                        or his staff which may be located off-site;
                  
                  d.    shall  be permitted during their attendances  to  directly  observe
                        clinic practices,  including  but not limited to those with respect
                        to urine drug screening practices; and
                  
                  e.    shall report to the College at  least  every  month regarding their
                        attendances described at (a) above, and immediately  under  certain
                        circumstances,  including should the Practice Monitor form concerns
                        regarding patient  exposure  to  harm, such reports to be including
                        with respect to:
                  
                        1.    maintenance of infection control and prevention standards;
                  
                        2.    urine drug screening practices; and
                  
                        3.    appropriateness of staff interactions with patients. 
                  
            v.    Dr. Pardis shall keep a log of all prescriptions  for, and all refills or
                  renewals of prescriptions for methadone, in the form  attached as set out
                  in Schedule "A" to the Order, which will include at least  the  following
                  information (the "Prescribing Log"):  

                  (a)   the date of the in-person appointment;
                  (b)   the name of the patient and chart/file number;
                  
                  (c)   the details of the dose prescribed;
                  
                  (d)   confirmation  that  the  patient was currently prescribed methadone
                        prior to the prescription  in  question,  with  the  source  of the
                        confirmation noted; and
                  
                  (e)   Dr. Pardis' signature.
                  
            vi.   Dr. Pardis shall keep a copy of all prescriptions he writes and a copy of
                  all refills or renewals of prescriptions he authorizes for methadone,  in
                  the corresponding patient chart.

            vii.  Dr.  Pardis  shall  ensure  that  the undertaking of the Practice Monitor
                  attached at Schedule "B" to the Order  is delivered to the College within
                  thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.  

            viii. If during or after an inspection, the Practice  Monitor  is  of  the view
                  that  any aspect of the administration of the clinic or practice location
                  or any  practice  there  will  expose or is likely to expose a patient or
                  patients  to  harm,  Dr.  Pardis  shall   immediately   comply  with  any
                  recommendations  made  by the Practice Monitor to protect the  patient(s)
                  from harm.

            ix.   Dr. Pardis shall consent to the disclosure by his Practice Monitor and by
                  staff and colleagues at any location where Dr. Pardis practices or at any
                  pharmacy to the College  of  all  information  necessary  to  fulfil  the
                  Practice  Monitor's undertaking and to monitor and facilitate Dr. Pardis'
                  compliance with the Order.

            x.    Dr.  Pardis   shall   cooperate  with  any  inspection  of  his  practice
                  location(s) by the College,  which  may  be made without notice and which
                  may include but not be limited to reviews  of patient charts and/or other
                  records  and  to  interviews of staff at any location  where  Dr.  Pardis
                  practices, in order to monitor his compliance with the Order.  Dr. Pardis
                  shall consent to the  disclosure by the College to any Chief of Staff, or
                  a colleague with similar  responsibilities,  at any practice location, of
                  all  information  deemed  by the College to be necessary  to  monitor  or
                  facilitate Dr. Pardis' compliance with the Order.

            xi.   Dr. Pardis shall, within fourteen  (14)  days  of the date of this Order,
                  provide  the  College  with  the  addresses  of  all locations  where  he
                  practices, and, if he commences practice at a new  location subsequently,
                  shall  provide  the  College  with its address within five  (5)  days  of
                  commencing practice at that location.

            xii.  Dr. Pardis shall, within fourteen  (14)  days  of the date of this Order,
                  provide to the College his irrevocable consent in  the  form  attached at
                  Schedule  "C"  to the Order for the College to make appropriate enquiries
                  of the Ontario Health  Insurance  Plan  ("OHIP"),  and  the  Drug Program
                  Services  Branch - Narcotics Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented  under
                  the Narcotics  Safety  and Awareness Act, 2010, to monitor his compliance
                  with the terms of this Order.
            xiii. If Dr. Pardis has not delivered  an  undertaking  signed  by  a  Practice
                  Monitor to the College within thirty (30) days of the date of this  Order
                  (the "Restriction Date"), Dr. Pardis shall be restricted from prescribing
                  or   from   authorizing   any  refills  or  renewals  of  or  release  of
                  prescriptions for methadone,  and the fact of this restriction shall be a
                  term, condition or limitation on  his  certificate  of  registration.  In
                  addition, Dr. Pardis shall immediately notify his patients that as of the
                  Restriction Date, he is restricted from prescribing methadone,  and shall
                  refer  all  patients  to whom he prescribes methadone to other physicians
                  for assessment and care. 

            xiv.  If  a Practice Monitor who  has  given  an  undertaking  as  attached  at
                  Schedule  "B"  to the Order is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill
                  its provisions,  Dr.  Pardis  shall, within thirty (30) days of receiving
                  notice of same, obtain an executed  undertaking  in  the same form from a
                  similarly  qualified person who is acceptable to the College  and  ensure
                  that it is delivered to the College within that time.

            xv.   If Dr. Pardis is unable to obtain a Practice Monitor on the terms set out
                  in (vi or xiii) above, Dr. Pardis shall immediately comply with the terms
                  set out at (xii) above.


            (3 of 4)
            As from 12:00 p.m.,  March 8, 2017, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians  and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
            and limitations are imposed  on  the  certificate  of  registration held by Dr.
            Bijan Pardis:

            Clinical Supervision 

            (a)   Dr. Pardis shall retain a clinical supervisor, approved  by  the College,
                  who will sign an undertaking in the form attached hereto as Appendix  "A"
                  (the  "Clinical  Supervisor"),  to be returned to the College in executed
                  form no later than seven (7) days  after  the  date  of  this Order.  Dr.
                  Pardis  shall practise with respect to his methadone practice  under  the
                  guidance  of  the  Clinical  Supervisor for a period of three (3) months,
                  during which time the Clinical Supervisor will at minimum review at least
                  ten (10) of Dr. Pardis' patient  charts  from his methadone practice once
                  every month, to be selected independently  by  the  Clinical  Supervisor.
                  Dr.  Pardis  shall meet with the Clinical Supervisor at least once  every
                  month at his Practice  Location  or  another  location  approved  by  the
                  College  to  discuss  any concerns related to patient care and/or arising
                  from the Clinical Supervisor's  chart  review. Dr. Pardis shall cooperate
                  fully with the Clinical Supervisor and shall abide by the recommendations
                  of  the  Clinical  Supervisor,  including,  but   not   limited  to,  any
                  recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional development. 

            (b)   If a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Order is
                  unable  or  unwilling  to continue to fulfil its provisions,  Dr.  Pardis
                  shall, within twenty (20)  days  of  receiving  notice of same, obtain an
                  executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly  qualified  person
                  who  is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to  the
                  College within that time.

            (c)   If Dr. Pardis is unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the provisions
                  set out  under  paragraphs  3(a) and/or (b) above, Dr. Pardis shall cease
                  practising  medicine until such  time  as  he  has  obtained  a  Clinical
                  Supervisor acceptable  to  the  College.  If  he  is  required  to  cease
                  practising  medicine  as a result of the application of this term of this
                  Order, this requirement  shall constitute a term, condition or limitation
                  on his certificate of registration and that term, condition or limitation
                  will be included on the College's public register. 

            Reassessment

            (d)   Within approximately six (6) months after the completion of the period of
                  Clinical Supervision referred to above in paragraph 3(a), Dr. Pardis will
                  submit  to  a  reassessment  of   his   methadone  practice  (the  "First
                  Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors  selected  by the College (the
                  "Assessor(s)").   The  Reassessment  may  include a chart review,  direct
                  observation  of  Dr.  Pardis'  care,  interviews   with   colleagues  and
                  co-workers,  feedback from patients and any other tools deemed  necessary
                  by the College.  The  First  Reassessment shall be at Dr. Pardis' expense
                  and  he  shall  co-operate  fully   with   all   elements  of  the  First
                  Reassessment. Dr. Pardis shall abide by all recommendations  made  by the
                  Assessor(s)  subject to paragraph (f) below, and the results of the First
                  Reassessment will  be  reported  to the College and may form the basis of
                  further action by the College.

            (e)   Within  approximately twelve (12) months  after  the  completion  of  the
                  process of  the  First  Reassessment, Dr. Pardis will submit to a further
                  reassessment of his methadone  practice (the "Second Reassessment") by an
                  assessor or assessors selected by  the  College (the "Assessor(s)").  The
                  Second Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation of Dr.
                  Pardis' care, interviews with colleagues  and  co-workers,  feedback from
                  patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.  The Second
                  Reassessment  shall  be  at  Dr.  Pardis' expense and he shall co-operate
                  fully  with all elements of the Second  Reassessment.  Dr.  Pardis  shall
                  abide by all recommendations made by the Assessor(s) subject to paragraph
                  (f) below, and the results of the Second Reassessment will be reported to
                  the College and may form the basis of further action by the College.

            (f)   If after  either  the  First or Second Reassessment, Dr. Pardis is of the
                  view that any of the Assessor(s)'s  recommendations  are unreasonable, he
                  will have fifteen (15) days following his receipt of the  recommendations
                  within which to provide the College with his submissions in  this regard.
                  The  Inquiries  Complaints  and  Reports  ("ICR") Committee will consider
                  those  submissions  and  make  a  determination   regarding  whether  the
                  recommendations are reasonable, and that decision will be provided to Dr.
                  Pardis.  Following  that  decision,  Dr.  Pardis  will  abide   by  those
                  recommendations  of the Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined
                  are reasonable.  Any  recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                  conditions or limitations on Dr. Pardis' practice and any recommendations
                  of  the  Assessor(s) which  the  ICR  Committee  has  identified  in  its
                  decision(s)  referenced  in  this  term  of  this  Order  shall be terms,
                  conditions or limitations on Dr. Pardis' practice, to be included  on the
                  College's public register.

            Other

            (g)   Dr.  Pardis shall inform the College of each and every location where  he
                  practices,  in any jurisdiction (his "Practice Location(s)") within seven
                  (7) days of this  Order,  and shall inform the College of any and all new
                  Practice Locations within seven  (7)  days of commencing practice at that
                  location, until the report of the assessment  of  his  practice have been
                  reported to the College.

            (h)   Dr.   Pardis  shall  submit  to,  and  not  interfere  with,  unannounced
                  inspections of his Practice Location(s) and and to any other activity the
                  College  deems  necessary  in  order  to  monitor his compliance with the
                  provisions of this Order. 

            (i)   Dr.  Pardis  shall give his irrevocable consent  to  the  College  making
                  appropriate enquiries  of  the  Ontario  Health  Insurance Plan, the Drug
                  Program  Services  Branch,  the Narcotics Monitoring  System  implemented
                  under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, and/or any person who
                  or institution that may have  relevant  information,  in  order  for  the
                  College to monitor his compliance with this Order.

            (j)   Dr.  Pardis  shall give his irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to all Clinical Supervisors and/or Assessors:

                  a.    Any information  the  College  has that led to the circumstances of
                        this Order;
                  b.    Any information arising from any  investigation into, or assessment
                        of, Dr. Pardis' practice; 
                  c.    Any information arising from the monitoring  of his compliance with
                        this Order or of any Undertaking to the College  into  which he has
                        entered. 
                  
            (k)   Dr. Pardis shall give his irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors
                  and  Assessors  to  disclose  to  the  College  and  to  one  another any
                  information:

                  a.    Relevant  to  this Order or to any Undertaking to the College  into
                        which he has entered,  including  but not limited to his compliance
                        with the same;
                  b.    Relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A" to this Order;
                  c.    Relevant to the First or Second Reassessment; and/or
                  d.    Which comes to their attention in the  course of their duties under
                        this Order and which they reasonably believe  indicates a potential
                        risk of harm to his patients. 
                  
            (l)   Dr.  Pardis  shall be responsible for any and all costs  associated  with
                  implementing the terms of this Order.

            (4 of 4)
            As from March 8, 2017,  the  following  is  imposed  as  a  term, condition and
            limitation  on  the  certificate of registration held by Dr. Bijan  Pardis,  in
            accordance with an undertaking  and  consent given by Dr. Pardis to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                                                of
                                          DR. BIJAN PARDIS
                                          ("Dr. Pardis")
                                                to
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                                                                                     

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions  Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act,  1991,  S.O.  1991,  c.  18,  as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "NMS"  means  the  Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means  the  College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Pardis, certificate of registration  number  68742, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I,  Dr.  Pardis,  acknowledge  that the College referred  allegations  of
                  professional misconduct regarding  my  family  practice  and my methadone
                  practice to the Discipline Committee in a Notice of Hearing  dated  March
                  23, 2016 (the "Notice of Hearing").

            (4)   I,  Dr.  Pardis,  acknowledge  that  I have not practised family medicine
                  since April 24, 2016 pending the hearing  before the Discipline Committee
                  regarding the allegations against me.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Pardis, undertake to abide by the provisions  of this Undertaking,
                  effective March 8, 2017 at 12:01 a.m.

            (6)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Pardis, undertake that I will not engage  in the practice of
                        family medicine.
                  
            (7)   Notification of Patients and Communication with Family Physicians

                  (a)   I,  Dr. Pardis, undertake that I shall advise each  of  my  current
                        patients  at his or her next appointment, and each new or returning
                        patient in future, in writing, that:
                  
                        i.    I cannot  act as their family physician or provide any family
                              medicine services to them;
                        ii.   I advise them  to  have  a  family  physician and ask them to
                              provide me with their family physician's contact information;
                              and
                        iii.  It  is  desirable  that I be able to communicate  with  their
                              family physician for the purpose of providing health care and
                              ensuring that the family physician, who is in their circle of
                              care,  is  aware  of  my   treatment  and  receives  relevant
                              information.    
                  
                  (b)   I,  Dr.  Pardis,  undertake that in each  patient's  chart  I  will
                        maintain a copy of the written notification(s) that I have provided
                        to that patient as  described  in  section 7(a) above and signed by
                        the patient, and that I will maintain  in  the  patient's chart any
                        information  with  which  I or my staff is provided  regarding  the
                        identity  and  contact  information   of   each   patient's  family
                        physician. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Pardis, undertake that if a patient withholds, withdraws, or
                        limits consent for me to communicate with their family physician, I
                        will maintain a record of it in the patient's chart  and  will note
                        that  I have informed the patient that it is desirable that  family
                        physicians  be  aware  of  all treatments a patient is receiving. I
                        further acknowledge that I will  comply  with  the College's Policy
                        regarding  Confidentiality of Personal Health Information  (#8-05),
                        as amended from time to time. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Pardis,  undertake  that,  subject  to section 7(c) above, I
                        shall   communicate   to   each  patient's  family  physician   any
                        information  that  is  reasonably  necessary  for  providing  care,
                        including relevant test results.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Dr. Pardis, undertake  that  I  shall  post  a  sign  in the
                        waiting  room(s) of all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible
                        and secure  location,  in  the  form  set out at Appendix "A."  For
                        further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: "Dr. Pardis must
                        not practise family medicine. Further information  may  be found on
                        the  College  of  Physicians  and  Surgeons  of Ontario website  at
                        www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Pardis, undertake to post a certified translation(s)  in any
                        language(s)  in which I provide services, of the sign described  in
                        section 7 (e)  in the waiting room(s) of all my Practice Locations,
                        in a clearly visible  and  secure  location, in the form set out at
                        Appendix "A." 
                  
                  (g)   I,  Dr.  Pardis,  undertake  that  if  I  provide  service  in  any
                        language(s) other than English to a patient  to whom I am providing
                        written notice under section 7(a) above, I will provide such notice
                        in  a  certified  translation in the language in  which  I  provide
                        service to the patient. 
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Pardis, undertake  to  provide  the certified translation(s)
                        described in sections 7(f) and (g), to the  College  within  thirty
                        (30) days of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (i)   I,  Dr.  Pardis, undertake that if I elect, after the execution  of
                        this Undertaking,  to  provide services in any other language(s), I
                        will notify the College prior to providing any such services. 
                  
                  (j)   I, Dr. Pardis, undertake  to  provide  to the College the certified
                        translation(s) described in section 7(f) and (g) prior to beginning
                        to provide services in the language(s) described in section 7(i).
                  
            (8)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Pardis, undertake to inform the College  of  each  and every
                        location  where  I practise or have privileges, including, but  not
                        limited  to,  hospital(s),   clinic(s)   and   office(s),   in  any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within  five
                        (5)  days  of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to  inform  the  College  of  any  and  all  new Practice
                        Locations  within  five  (5)  days  of commencing practice at  that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Pardis, undertake that I will  submit  to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations  and patient
                        charts  by  a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Pardis,  give  my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of  OHIP,  NMS,  and/or  any  person  who  or
                        institution  that  may  have relevant information, in order for the
                        College  to  monitor my compliance  with  the  provisions  of  this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Pardis,  acknowledge  that  I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "B".
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Pardis, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I,  Dr.  Pardis,  acknowledge  and  undertake  that  I  shall  be  solely
                  responsible  for  payment  of  all fees, costs, charges,  expenses,  etc.
                  arising  from  the implementation  of  any  of  the  provisions  of  this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Pardis, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing  this  Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Pardis, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague  with  similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Pardis, acknowledge that a breach by me  of  any provision of this
                  Undertaking  may  constitute  an  act  of professional misconduct  and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral  of  specified  allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (14)  I,  Dr.  Pardis,  acknowledge  that  this Undertaking constitutes  terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate  of  registration  for  the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I,  Dr.  Pardis, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking  remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Pardis,  acknowledge  that,  in addition to this Undertaking
                        being  posted  in  accordance  with  section   (15)(a)  above,  the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        Allegations of professional misconduct regarding  Dr.  Pardis  were
                        referred  to  the Discipline Committee of the College. As a result,
                        Dr. Pardis must not practise family medicine.
                  
                        Dr. Pardis must  notify  each  patient  in  his practice in writing
                        that:
                              1.    He cannot act as their family physician  or provide any
                                    family medicine services to them;
                              2.    He  advises  them to have a family physician  and  asks
                                    them  to provide  him  with  their  family  physician's
                                    contact information; and
                              3.    It is desirable  that  he  be  able to communicate with
                                    their  family  physician for the purpose  of  providing
                                    health care and ensuring that the family physician, who
                                    is in their circle  of  care, is aware of his treatment
                                    and receives relevant information.
                  
                        Dr. Pardis must communicate to each patient's  family physician any
                        information  that  is  reasonably  necessary  for  providing  care,
                        including relevant test results, subject to any limit placed by the
                        patient on his doing so. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Pardis, give my irrevocable consent to the College  to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that  led  to  the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Mar 2017
Summary:

On  March  8,  2017,  the  Discipline  Committee  found that  Dr. Pardis has  committed  an  act  of 
professional misconduct, in  that he has  failed  to  maintain  the  standard  of  practice  of  the 
profession. 

Dr. Pardis is a family physician who practised in the Greater Toronto area, maintaining both a 
family practice and a methadone practice. 
 
Family Practice 
 
In February 2013, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College required Dr. 
Pardis to complete a specified education and remediation program directed at his family practice, 
including coursework, a preceptorship, and a reassessment. The preceptor identified a number of 
concerns with Dr. Pardis’ practice, including a need for better documentation of physician-
patient encounters and to consistently update Cumulative Patient Profiles. The preceptor found 
that Dr. Pardis made improvements in his recordkeeping throughout the course of the 
preceptorship, however, identified a number of specific care concerns, including two cases in 
which symptoms that Dr. Pardis failed to investigate could be due to an underlying malignancy. 
As a result, the College commenced an investigation into Dr. Pardis’ practice. 
 
The medical expert who reviewed Dr. Pardis’ family practice observed that Dr. Pardis’ practice 
consisted primarily of immigrants from Iran, many of whom spent time regularly in Iran while 
also seeing physicians there, and that it was difficult to provide comprehensive coordinated care 
to those patients. He indicated that Dr. Pardis provided care with cultural sensitivity and 
demonstrated knowledge of the circumstances of their lives. However, Dr. Pardis failed to meet 
the standard of practice of the profession. His recordkeeping fell below the standard in most 
caess. He failed to provide preventive care that met the standard of practice in the majority of 
cases. He lacked a coordinated approach to chronic disease management. He did not document; 
weighingthe risks when prescribing non-steroidal anti-inflammatory drugs (“NSAIDs”) to 
patients with cardiovascular risk factors and/or gastrointestinal inflammation and lacked 
knowledge in this regard.. Hedid not take steps to provide renal and vascular protection to 
patients with diabetes. He engaged in over-testing and over-screening, including by ordering 
unnecessary echocardiograms and routine blood and urine testing without justification. He 
overprescribed antibiotics for viral illnesses. He co-ordinated care poorly with consultants 
regarding medication management. 
 
The medical expert found a more immediate risk of harm in four cases, and found that on 
balance that Dr. Pardis’ care was “substandard” and represented a potential risk of harm. 
 
Methadone Practice 
 
As a result of clinical concerns on the part of the College’s Methadone Committee regarding Dr. 
Pardis’ methadone practice and his ongoing deviations from the Methadone Maintenance 
Treatment Guidelines, Dr. Pardis entered into an undertaking on November 9, 2010, by which he 
agreed that his methadone practice would be subject to clinical supervision and would be 
reassessed by a College-appointed assessor. 
The assessor found that Dr. Pardis failed to meet the standard of practice of the profession 
                                      1 

regarding three patients, and in his medical record-keeping, which was so deficient that it was 
not possible to determine in other cases whether his care met the standard of practice of the 
profession. The assessor also noted concerns regarding Dr. Pardis’ prescribing of testosterone 
replacement to methadone patients, specifically appropriate dosage and regular monitoring of the 
same in eight cases. 
 
In response to the assessor’s concerns, Dr. Pardis indicated that he had made changes to his 
practice, including only prescribing medications in his methadone practice that are related to 
methadone treatment and its side effects, seeking to improve his counselling of patients about 
side effects and risks of medications and documenting those discussions, and documenting 
patient counselling. He also advised that he had upgraded his electronic medical recordkeeping 
system to include a methadone module. 
 
College History 
 
In February 2013, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) of the College 
considered a report of an investigation into Dr. Pardis’ family practice, which noted deficiencies 
of care, including in primary prevention. The ICRC ordered Dr. Pardis to undergo a specified 
continuing education or remediation program (“SCERP”), which resulted in the preceptorship 
described above. The ICRC also issued Dr. Pardis a written caution with respect to his record-
keeping, which it described as “very deficient,” and provided him with advice about his practice 
management. 
 
Also in February 2013, the ICRC issued in a public complaint a written caution to Dr. Pardis 
with respect to compliance with the College policy on Ending the Physician-Patient Relationship 
and also practice deficiencies that result in poor patient care, including that: he should not treat 
methadone patients for chronic pain or for other medical problems (i.e. family practice 
concerns); he should ensure better practice management, e.g. assigning appointment times; he 
should ensure his medical record-keeping is in keeping with the expectations set out in the 
College policy on Medical Records.  
 
Dr. Pardis’ Status Pending the Hearing 
 
The ICRC made an interim order on April 12, 2016 under section 37 of the Health Professions 
Procedural Code, pending resolution of the allegations against him, Dr. Pardis was required, 
among other things, to practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor acceptable to the 
College in his family medicine practice. On April 15, 2016, Dr. Pardis’ counsel advised that, as 
Dr. Pardis did not expect to be able to find a clinical supervisor for his family practice, he would 
cease practising family medicine as of April 24, 2016. Dr. Pardis has not practised family 
medicine since that date. 
 
Dr. Pardis entered into an interim undertaking regarding his methadone practice pending 
resolution of the allegations against him. Among other things, Dr. Pardis agreed to practise under 
the guidance of a clinical supervisor acceptable to the College in respect of his methadone 
practice. Dr. Pardis practised under the guidance of a clinical supervisor in respect of his 
methadone practice pending the hearing. The clinical supervisor’s reports have been positive. 
                                      2 

 
Dr. Pardis’ Undertaking 
 
Dr. Pardis entered into an undertaking dated March 8, 2017, not to practise family medicine, 
effective immediately. He has agreed to notify each of his methadone patients in writing that he 
cannot act as their family physician or provide primary care, and to advise them that they should 
have their own family physician. Dr. Pardis has undertaken to maintain a record of this 
communication in each patient’s chart and to note in the patient’s chart whether he or she has a 
family physician and, if so, who that is, and to communicate relevant information to each 
patient’s family physician. 
 
Disposition 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered that:  
-  The Registrar to place the following terms, conditions and limitations, effective immediately, 
   on Dr. Pardis’ certificate of registration:  
Clinical Supervision  
(a)   Dr. Pardis shall retain a clinical supervisor, approved by the College, who will sign an 
      undertaking in the form attached hereto as Appendix “A” (the “Clinical Supervisor”), to 
      be returned to the College in executed form no later than seven (7) days after the date of 
      this Order.  Dr. Pardis shall practise with respect to his methadone practice under the 
      guidance of the Clinical Supervisor for a period of three (3) months, during which time 
      the Clinical Supervisor will at minimum review at least ten (10) of Dr. Pardis’ patient 
      charts from his methadone practice once every month, to be selected independently by 
      the Clinical Supervisor.  Dr. Pardis shall meet with the Clinical Supervisor at least once 
      every month at his Practice Location or another location approved by the College to 
      discuss any concerns related to patient care and/or arising from the Clinical Supervisor’s 
      chart review. Dr. Pardis shall cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervisor and shall abide 
      by the recommendations of the Clinical Supervisor, including, but not limited to, any 
      recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional development.  
(b)   If a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix “A” to this Order is unable or 
      unwilling to continue to fulfil its provisions, Dr. Pardis shall, within twenty (20) days of 
      receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a 
      similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered 
      to the College within that time. 
(c)   If Dr. Pardis is unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under 
      paragraphs 3(a) and/or (b) above, Dr. Pardis shall cease practising medicine until such 
      time as he has obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College. If he is required 
      to cease practising medicine as a result of the application of this term of this Order, this 
      requirement shall constitute a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of 
      registration and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the College’s public 
      register.  
Reassessment 
(d)   Within approximately six (6) months after the completion of the period of Clinical 
      Supervision referred to above in paragraph 3(a), Dr. Pardis will submit to a reassessment 
      of his methadone practice (the “First Reassessment”) by an assessor or assessors selected 
                                      3 

      by the College (the “Assessor(s)”).  The Reassessment may include a chart review, direct 
      observation of Dr. Pardis’ care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback 
      from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College. The First 
      Reassessment shall be at Dr. Pardis’ expense and he shall co-operate fully with all 
      elements of the First Reassessment. Dr. Pardis shall abide by all recommendations made 
      by the Assessor(s) subject to paragraph (f) below, and the results of the First 
      Reassessment will be reported to the College and may form the basis of further action by 
      the College. 
(e)   Within approximately twelve (12) months after the completion of the process of the First 
      Reassessment, Dr. Pardis will submit to a further reassessment of his methadone practice 
      (the “Second Reassessment”) by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the 
      “Assessor(s)”).  The Second Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation 
      of Dr. Pardis’ care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients 
      and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.  The Second Reassessment shall be 
      at Dr. Pardis’ expense and he shall co-operate fully with all elements of the Second 
      Reassessment. Dr. Pardis shall abide by all recommendations made by the Assessor(s) 
      subject to paragraph (f) below, and the results of the Second Reassessment will be 
      reported to the College and may form the basis of further action by the College. 
(f)   If after either the First or Second Reassessment, Dr. Pardis is of the view that any of the 
      Assessor(s)’s recommendations are unreasonable, he will have fifteen (15) days 
      following his receipt of the recommendations within which to provide the College with 
      his submissions in this regard.  The Inquiries Complaints and Reports (“ICR”) 
      Committee will consider those submissions and make a determination regarding whether 
      the recommendations are reasonable, and that decision will be provided to Dr. Pardis. 
      Following that decision, Dr. Pardis will abide by those recommendations of the 
      Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable.  Any 
      recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms, conditions or limitations on Dr. 
      Pardis’ practice and any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR Committee 
      has identified in its decision(s) referenced in this term of this Order shall be terms, 
      conditions or limitations on Dr. Pardis’ practice, to be included on the College’s public 
      register. 
Other 
(g)   Dr. Pardis shall inform the College of each and every location where he practices, in any 
      jurisdiction (his “Practice Location(s)”) within seven (7) days of this Order, and shall 
      inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within seven (7) days of 
      commencing practice at that location, until the report of the assessment of his practice 
      have been reported to the College. 
(h)   Dr. Pardis shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of his Practice 
      Location(s) and and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor 
      his compliance with the provisions of this Order.  
(i)   Dr. Pardis shall give his irrevocable consent to the College making appropriate enquiries 
      of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan, the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics 
      Monitoring System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, 
      and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the 
      College to monitor his compliance with this Order. 
                                      4 

(j)   Dr. Pardis shall give his irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following 
      information to all Clinical Supervisors and/or Assessors: 
      a. Any information the College has that led to the circumstances of this Order; 
      b. Any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, Dr. Pardis’ 
         practice;  
      c. Any information arising from the monitoring of his compliance with this Order or of 
         any Undertaking to the College into which he has entered.  
(k)   Dr. Pardis shall give his irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors and Assessors to 
      disclose to the College and to one another any information: 
      a. Relevant to this Order or to any Undertaking to the College into which he has entered, 
         including but not limited to his compliance with the same; 
      b. Relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor’s undertaking set out at 
         Appendix “A” to this Order;  
      c. Relevant to the First or Second Reassessment; and/or 
      d. Which comes to their attention in the course of their duties under this Order and 
         which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to his patients.  
(l)   Dr. Pardis shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with implementing the 
      terms of this Order. 
-  Dr. Pardis appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-  Dr. Pardis pay to the College costs in the amount of $5,500.00, within 30 days of the date of 
   this Order.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): March 8, 2017

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 8, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Bijan Pardis to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 8, 2017:

Allegations of professional misconduct regarding Dr. Pardis were referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. As a result, Dr. Pardis must not practise family medicine.

Dr. Pardis must notify each patient in his practice in writing that:
1. He cannot act as their family physician or provide any family medicine services to them;

2. He advises them to have a family physician and asks them to provide him with their family physician’s contact information; and

3. It is desirable that he be able to communicate with their family physician for the purpose of providing health care and ensuring that the family physician, who is in their circle of care, is aware of his treatment and receives relevant information.

Dr. Pardis must communicate to each patient’s family physician any information that is reasonably necessary for providing care, including relevant test results, subject to any limit placed by the patient on his doing so.