skip to content

Bigi, Sandra

CPSO#: 97079

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 24 Oct 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Basel, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 05 Dec 2011 to 16 Feb 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 17 Feb 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Oct 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Oct 2014