skip to content

Bienenstock, Leonard

CPSO#: 91236

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Nov 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Nov 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Comprehensive Treatment Clinic
1154 Danforth
Toronto ON  M4J 1M3
Phone: 647-490-4008
Fax: 647-689-5890 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Tikun Addiction Services
Suite 7 - 389 Main Street North
Brampton ON  L6X 3P1
Canada
Phone: 289-752-2295
Fax: 289-752-4055
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

La Fontaine Source De Jeunesse
890 A Yonge St
Toronto ON  M4W 3P4
Canada
Phone: (416) 962-4444
Fax: (416) 925-8555
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Sep 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LEONARD BIENENSTOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIENENSTOCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 11 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 12 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2015