Bielecki, Matthew (CPSO#: 100023)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 15 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Steven Zizzo's office: Suite 206 325 Winterberry Drive Hamilton ON L8J 0B6 T: 905 575 9004 F: 905 575 9026
Instructions: Contact above as electronic copy of records are kept there.
Date Received: 15 Dec 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Mar 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2014