skip to content

Bielecki, Barbara Ania

CPSO#: 86344

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Names: Bielecki, Barbara Ania Kuziora (used until: 28 Jan 2015 )     Kuziora, Barbara Ania (used until: 17 Feb 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 311
15 Mountain Ave South
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 2V6
Phone: (905) 662-4911
Fax: (905) 662-1688 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Barbara Bielecki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Bielecki ( CPSO# 86344 )

Business Address:
311 - 15 Mountain Avenue
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 2V6
Phone Number: (905) 662-4911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BARBARA ANIA BIELECKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIELECKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009