skip to content

Bielas, Katarzyna Ewa

CPSO#: 98336

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Aug 2021
EXPIRY DATE
25 Aug 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. K. Bielas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:07 Apr 2015 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 Jan 2015 to 06 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Apr 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Aug 2021