skip to content

Biederman, Jessica Lee May

CPSO#: 84630

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Belleville General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1E2
Phone: (613) 969-7400 Ext. 2860
Fax: (613) 969-5561 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jessica L.M. Biederman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Biederman ( CPSO# 84630 )

Business Address:
Belleville General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JESSICA LEE MAY BIEDERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIEDERMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011