skip to content

Bidmead, Nicholas Rodney

CPSO#: 30911

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Underserviced Area Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Mar 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010