skip to content

Bianchi, Fernando Anthony

CPSO#: 17503

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Mar 1963
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 1963

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
401-25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone: 905-527-5465 Electoral District: 04

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients requesting a copy of their medical record may contact Records Xpress at telephone: 416-849-5991.
Date Received: 28 Mar 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:16 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FERNANDO ANTHONY BIANCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIANCHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1960
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Mar 1963
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 1963