skip to content

Iannantuono, Biagio

CPSO#: 65121

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Aug 2023

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Iannantuono and Kappos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Iannantuono ( CPSO# 65121 )
Dr. S. Kappos ( CPSO# 65611 )

Business Address:
Archdekon Medical Group
Box 660
205 Hiram Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 1T9
Phone Number: (705) 645-9252

Business Address:
South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Phone Number: (705) 646-4400

 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
For requests for medical records please contact Dr. Rohit Gupta and Dr. Jessica Reid at the below address:

9 Ann Street
Bracebridge, ON  P1L 2E4

Fax: (705) 646-1473
Dr. Reid phone: (705) 646-8957
Dr. Gupta phone: (705) 645-7749
Date Received: 29 Mar 2022

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  March 25, 2022
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On March 25, 2022, Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare notified the College, pursuant to s. 33(d) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Biagio Iannantuono resigned his privileges as of March 21, 2022.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1993
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 08 Dec 2009
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 08 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2023
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal Effective: 02 Aug 2023
Suspension of registration imposed: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal Effective: 03 Aug 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal Effective: 03 Aug 2023 Active
 As from August 2, 2023 by order of the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal, the following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Biagio Iannantuono: 

Professional Education:

(i) Dr. Iannantuono shall successfully complete individualized instruction in professionalism and ethics satisfactory to the College, with an instructor selected by the College, within six (6) months of the date of this Order.

Therapy:

(ii) Dr. Iannantuono shall engage in therapy with a College-approved mental health professional, who shall provide written reports to the College quarterly for two (2) years from the date of this Order and thereafter, every six (6) months.

(iii) Dr. Iannantuono shall meet with the mental health professional as often as recommended by the mental health professional.

Practice Monitoring:

(iv) Dr. Iannantuono shall not engage in any professional encounters, in person or otherwise ("Professional Encounter" or "Professional Encounters"), with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the Professional Encounter takes place in the continuous presence and under the continuous observation of a monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College (the "Practice Monitor" or "Practice Monitors") who shall enter into the Practice Monitor's undertaking, attached as Appendix "A." For further clarity, Dr. Iannantuono must not be alone with any patient, for any length of time, during any Professional Encounter, whether or not the parent or guardian of the patient is also present.

(v) At all times, Dr. Iannantuono shall ensure that a Practice Monitor shall:

(a) remain present at all times during all Professional Encounters, in person or otherwise, with all patients;

(b) carefully observe all of Dr. Iannantuono's Professional Encounters with patients, including but not limited to physical and internal examinations. It is Dr. Iannantuono's obligation to ensure the Practice Monitor's view of all of his Professional Encounters with patients, including physical and internal examinations, is unobstructed at all times;

(c) refrain from performing any other functions, except those required in the Practice Monitor's undertaking attached as Appendix "A," while observing Dr. Iannantuono in all his Professional Encounters with patients

(d) keep a log of all Professional Encounters with patients in the form attached as Appendix "B" (the "Log");

(e) initial all corresponding entries in the records of patients noted in the Log to confirm that the Practice Monitor was in Dr. Iannantuono's presence at all times during the Professional Encounter;

(f) submit the original Log to the College on a monthly basis;

(g) provide reports (as described in the Practice Monitor's undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis; and

(h) remain free of any conflict of interest with Dr. Iannantuono.

(vi) Dr. Iannantuono shall maintain a copy of the Log, and make it available to the College on request.

Posting a Sign and Translations:

(vii) Dr. Iannantuono shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, at all times whether or not he is physically present at the Practice Location, in the form set out in Appendix "C" that states: Dr. Iannantuono must not have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients, of any age, unless in the continuous presence and under the continuous observation of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Iannantuono must not be alone during any professional encounter with any patient. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca".

(viii)	Dr. Iannantuono shall post a certified translation in any language in which he provides services, of the sign described in paragraph 4(b)(vii) above, in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix "C."

(ix) Dr. Iannantuono shall provide any certified translation(s) required by paragraph 4(b)(viii) above to the College within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.

Notifying Patients:

(x) Dr. Iannantuono shall ensure that each patient with whom he has a Professional Encounter is notified before the Professional Encounter of the restriction described in paragraph 4(b)(iv) above, in the presence of his Practice Monitor.

Notification of Practice Locations:

(xi) Dr. Iannantuono shall inform the College of each and every location at which he practices, delegates, or has privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which he is affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively his "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of this Order. Going forward, he shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

Practice Monitoring in a Hospital Setting

(xii) The College may accept an alternative arrangement with respect to practice monitoring in a hospital setting, in its sole discretion.

Monitoring of Compliance:

(xiii) Dr. Iannantuono shall consent to the College making appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor his compliance with the provisions of this Order, and Dr. Iannantuono shall sign any consents requested by the College to obtain such information from these persons or institutions.

(xiv) Dr. Iannantuono shall consent to submit and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of his Practice Locations and to the inspection of patient charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor his compliance with the provisions of this Order.

(xv) Dr. Iannantuono shall consent to the College providing any information to the Practice Monitor that the College deems necessary or desirable in order to assist the Practice Monitor in fulfilling their undertaking and in order to Monitor Dr. Iannantuono's compliance with this Order.

(xvi)	Dr. Iannatuono shall consent to any Practice Monitor disclosing to the College, and to any other Practice Monitor, any information relevant to this Order, relevant to the terms of the Practice Monitor's undertaking and/or relevant for the purpose of monitoring Dr. Iannantuono's compliance with this Order.

(xvii)	Dr. Iannatuono shall consent to the College providing this Order to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff"), and to providing any Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that has led to this Order and/or any information arising from the monitoring of his compliance with this Order.

Costs of Implementation:

(xviii) Dr. Iannantuono shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with implementing the terms of this Order.




Previous Hearings

Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 02 Aug 2023
Summary:

On August 2, 2023, the Tribunal found that Dr. Iannantuono engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and conduct unbecoming a physician in that:
  • he asked Ms. X, an ultrasound technician and a hospital colleague, to perform a scrotal ultrasound on him, circumventing the hospital’s usual practices with respect to imaging requisitions;
  • he repeatedly exposed his penis to Ms. X during the ultrasound, contrary to her instructions with respect to gowning/draping; and
  • he repeatedly caused Ms. X’s hand to make contact with his penis.
The Tribunal ordered that:
  1. Dr. Iannantuono attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
  2. the Registrar suspend Dr. Iannantuono’s certificate of registration for 18 months commencing August 3, 2023;
  3. the Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Iannantuono’s certificate of registration;
  4. Dr. Iannantuono pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by September 4, 2023.
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected]


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2023-08-02

 

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Dec 2009
Summary:

On December 8, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Iannantuono committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Dr. Iannantuono, a general surgeon, had his office nurse do postoperative examinations on patients following surgery, including hernia repair patients. Ms. X was employed as a nurse in Dr. Iannantuono's office. In mid 2008, Dr. Iannantuono spoke to Ms. X about her scrotal examinations and offered to assist her in learning proper examination techniques by doing a scrotal examination on him. Ms. X rejected the idea and was clearly uncomfortable with it. Dr. Iannantuono told Ms. X that no one needed to know about the incident. Previous to this incident, another nurse employed by Dr. Iannantuono had performed a practice scrotal examination on him.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. The Registrar suspend Dr. Iannantuono's certificate of registration for a period of one (1) month commencing on the date of this Order.

2. Dr. Iannantuono pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.

3. The results of this proceeding to be included in the register.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): December 8, 2009