skip to content

Bhushan, Chhabi

CPSO#: 20517

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 15 Dec 1986
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Lucknow, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1959
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 1960
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1961
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1962
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1963
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1966
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Oct 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1974
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Dec 1986