skip to content

Bhuptani, Neha

CPSO#: 98002

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Khandekar, Neha (used until: 27 May 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
955 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4M3P3
Phone: 4164612493
Fax: 4164618245 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

69 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R8
Canada
Phone: 416-368-5666
Fax: 416-368-2679
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

880 Danforth Road
Toronto ON  M1K1H2
Canada
Phone: 416-264-4848
Fax: 416-264-0547
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

880 Danforth Rd
Scarborough ON  M1K 1H8
Canada
Phone: 416-264-4848
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NEHA BHUPTANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHUPTANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014