skip to content

Bhullar, Supreet

CPSO#: 97591

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3051 Constitution Blvd
Mississauga ON  L4Y 2Z1
Phone: 9052798554 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

3051 CONSTITUTION BLVD
Mississauga ON  L4Y2Z1
Canada
Phone: 9052798554
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

2100 BOVAIRD DRIVE E
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

14-20 RED MAPLE DRIVE
Brampton ON  L6X4L8
Canada
Phone: 9054527771
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

475 Charolais Blvd
Brampton ON  L6Y 0M2
Canada
Phone: 9054543347
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUPREET BHULLAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHULLAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014