skip to content

Bhullar, Sundeep

CPSO#: 91928

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON  L7S0A2
Phone: (905) 6323737 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Milton District Hospital
7030 Derry Rd, Milton, ON
Milton ON  L9T7H6
Canada
Phone: (905) 878-2383
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Bhullar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bhullar ( CPSO# 91928 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:28 May 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUNDEEP BHULLAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHULLAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 23 Oct 2009
AVP - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 24 Sep 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 25 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 16 Jan 2012 to 20 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2012