skip to content

Bhinder, Sacha Sahib Singh

CPSO#: 90767

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Lung Care Clinic
2100 Ellesmere Road
Suite 328
Scarborough ON  M1H 3B7
Phone: (416) 439-0130
Fax: (416) 439-5508 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Maple
NA-House Calls
Toronto ON  M5V 1S2
Canada
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: (888) 745-0435
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Heart Health Institute--Ajax
235 Salem Rd South
2nd Floor
Ajax ON  L1Z 0B1
Canada
Phone: 905-426-8333
Fax: 905-426-4447
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:22 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SACHA SAHIB SINGH BHINDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHINDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013