skip to content

Bhatia, Rajni

CPSO#: 100413

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Pune, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B6V4
Phone: 8076846000 Electoral District: 09

Additional Practice Location(s)

554 Beverly Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B5V2
Canada
Phone: 8073444540
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Rajni Bhatia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bhatia ( CPSO# 100413)

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4

Business Address:
556 Beverly Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5V2


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAJNI BHATIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHATIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2015