skip to content

Bhat, Mamatha Pallavi

CPSO#: 87824

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 May 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 May 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Kannada

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Multi Organ Transplant Program
Peter Munk Building, 11-183
585 University Avenue, Toronto
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Bhat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:04 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:04 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAMATHA PALLAVI BHAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2007 to 18 Nov 2007
EL - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 2015