skip to content

Bhat, Khandige Rama

CPSO#: 25090

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Aug 1972

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Kannada

Education:Karnatak University Dharwar, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. K.R. Bhat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Bhat ( CPSO# 25090 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health Hospital
Breast Health Clinic
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (416) 726-3767

Medical Records Location

Address: 116 Cambridge Cres Richmond Hill, ON L4C 6G3
Date Received: 30 Jun 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:08 Mar 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020