skip to content

Bhargava, Someshwar

CPSO#: 26367

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Rajasthan University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 11 Burrows Road Ottawa, ON K1J 6E6
Date Received: 25 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:05 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2015