skip to content

Bhargava, Rakesh Kumar

CPSO#: 32162

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jan 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Bhopal University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Sciences Building
372 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2J9
Phone: (905) 721-1999
Fax: (905) 721-8564 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R.K. Bhargava Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bhargava ( CPSO# 32162 )

Business Address:
Medical Sciences Building
372 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2J9
Phone Number: (905) 721-1999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 06 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAKESH KUMAR BHARGAVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHARGAVA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1981