skip to content

Bhardwaj, Ajay Kumar

CPSO#: 97407

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Apr 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 17 Apr 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Windsor University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodbridge Medical Centre
Unit A13
9600 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T1
Phone: (905) 893-8085
Fax: (905) 893-8218 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ajay Bhardwaj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bhardwaj ( CPSO# 97407 )

Business Address:
Woodbridge Medical Centre
Unit A13
9600 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T1
Phone Number: (905) 893-8085


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Texas

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 04 Oct 2013

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2013 Active
             Dr. Ajay Kumar Bhardwaj may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
            only.