skip to content

Bhardwaj, Ajay Kumar

CPSO#: 97407

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Apr 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 17 Apr 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Windsor University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodbridge Medical Centre
Unit A13
9600 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T1
Phone: (905) 893-8085
Fax: (905) 893-8218 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

125 Kayla crescent
unit 8
Vaughan ON  L6A 4W3
Canada
Phone: 6478600594
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

8-125 Kayla Cres
Maple ON  L6A 4W3
Canada
Fax: 647-724-5285
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ajay Bhardwaj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bhardwaj ( CPSO# 97407 )

Business Address:
Woodbridge Medical Centre
Unit A13
9600 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T1
Phone Number: (905) 893-8085


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 04 Oct 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2013 Active
             Dr. Ajay Kumar Bhardwaj may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
            only.