skip to content

Bharatwal, Nirmala Dilip

CPSO#: 26290

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Bombay, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 20 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1965
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Dec 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018