skip to content

Bhanji, Rahima Amirali

CPSO#: 97384

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 24 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 26 Mar 2012 to 13 Apr 2012
EL - Gastroenterology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 30 Jul 2012 to 24 Aug 2012
EL - Hepatology/Liver Transplantation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2012