skip to content

Bhandal, Harleen Gill

CPSO#: 92070

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Sep 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 03 Sep 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Guru Govind Singh Medical College, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite Lower C
568 Christina Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 5W6
Phone: (519) 491-7775
Fax: (519) 344-2727 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Harleen Bhandal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Bhandal ( CPSO# 92070 )

Business Address:
Lower C - 568 Christina Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 5W6
Phone Number: (519) 491-7775


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:03 Sep 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Sep 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Dec 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2010 Active
 Dr.  Harleen  Gill  Bhandal may practise medicine independently in paediatrics,
            only.