skip to content

Bhan, Heather Elizabeth

CPSO#: 90649

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: Toews, Heather Elizabeth (used until: 14 May 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
274 Dundas Street East (Belleville)
Suite 303 and 305
Belleville ON
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613)779-7575
Fax: 613-779-8686 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Quinte Health Care
265 Dundas Street E
Belleville ON
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: (613)969-7400
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bhan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bhan ( CPSO# 88490 )
Dr. H. Bhan ( CPSO# 90649 )

Business Address:
QHC Regional Paediatric Services Consulting Group
305-274 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Phone Number: (613) 779-7575

Business Address:
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
P.E.C. Memorial Hospital
403 Main Street East
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-1008

Business Address:
Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6
Phone Number: (613) 392-2540

Business Address:
North Hastings Hospital
1-H Manor Lane
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Phone Number: (613) 332-2825

Business Address:
L.A.C.G. Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HEATHER ELIZABETH BHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013