skip to content

Bhalla, Sunil

CPSO#: 94187

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sint Eustatius, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Toronto sleep Centre
108-4040 finch avenue
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone: 4162933233
Fax: 4162930692 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

10333 southport road SW unit 103
calgary AB  T2W 3X6
Canada
Phone: 18558522989
Fax: 8772219327
County: 
Electoral District: 

Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb St
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Canada
Phone: (905) 579-1212
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Bluewater sleep disorder clinic
1258 Michigan avenue
Sarnia ON  N7S3Y2
Canada
Phone: 5193325333
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

Hospital alliance group
764 baker crescent
Kingston ON  K7M6P6
Canada
Phone: 6133894400
Fax: 6133894450
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sunil Bhalla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bhalla ( CPSO# 94187 )

Business Address:
North Toronto Sleep Centre
Suite 108
4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 293-3233


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUNIL BHALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHALLA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jul 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2014