skip to content

Bhalla, Jaswinder

CPSO#: 94886

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Mar 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 26 Oct 2017
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Jiwaji University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
115 Cedar Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1A9
Phone: 705 222 6287
Fax: 705 222 6288 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

1485 ,Bancroft drive
Sudbury ON  P3B 1R6
Canada
Phone: 705 222 1329
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jaswinder Bhalla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bhalla ( CPSO# 94886 )

Business Address:
115 Cedar Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1A9
Phone Number: (705) 222-6287

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Aug 2005 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 26 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 21 Feb 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 21 Feb 2019 Active
 

            As from February 21, 2019, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Jaswinder Bhalla in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Bhalla to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                         DR. JASWINDER BHALLA
                                            ("Dr. Bhalla")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Bhalla, certificate of registration number 94886, am a member of
                  the College.    

            (3)   I, Dr. Bhalla, acknowledge that the College conducted investigations
                  bearing File Numbers 100198, 100348, 101047, 102393 and 7216016 (the
                  "Investigations") into my standard of practice in my family medicine
                  practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Bhalla, was the subject of an Order of the ICR Committee dated
                  October 26, 2017 (the "Interim Order") during the course of the
                  Investigations.  I acknowledge that the Interim Order remains in force
                  until the Effective Date of this Undertaking as set out below.  

            (5)   I, Dr. Bhalla, acknowledge that, if an original copy of this Undertaking
                  as signed by me is accepted by the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports
                  Committee, the College will also deliver a caution in person. 


            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (6)   I, Dr. Bhalla, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR Committee
                  ("Effective Date").

            (7)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Bhalla, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the
                        College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for
                        six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Bhalla, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss practice improvement
                              recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, the office of the
                              Clinical Supervisor, or another location approved by the
                              College, once every month following an initial meeting;
                  
                        (iv)  Review at least twenty (20) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (vi)  Discuss with me the following resources, which I shall
                              review: 
                  
                              1.    http://www.cfp.ca/content/62/10/805
                  
                              2.    
                                    https://www.cma.ca/En/Pages/clinical-practice-guidelines.aspx;
                  
                              3.    https://canadiantaskforce.ca/;
                  
                              4.    Patient health questionnaire (PHQ-9):
                                    https://www2.gov.bc.ca/assets/gov/health/practitioner-pro/bc-guidelines/depression_patient_health_questionnaire.pdf;
                  
                              5.    Generalised Anxiety Disorder 7-Item Scale (GAD-7)
                                    https://www.integration.samhsa.gov/clinical-practice/GAD708.19.08Cartwright.pdf
                  
                              6.    
                                    http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Prescribing-Drugs#Narcotics;
                  
                              7.    http://nationalpaincentre.mcmaster.ca/opioid/
                                    (including reviewing
                                     the Opioid Manager);
                  
                              8.    
                                    https://thewellhealth.ca/wp-content/uploads/2017/03/CEP_CNCP_Main_V1.pdf;
                  
                              9.    
                                    www.cpso.on.ca/uploadedFiles/policies/policies/policyitems/medical_records.pdf;
                  
                        (vii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (viii)Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (ix)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Bhalla, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as
                        the areas of concern identified in the reports of the medical
                        inspector  dated August 15, 2017 and July 5, 2018 (File No.101047),
                        July 21, 2017, January 25, 2018 and April 29, 2018 (File No.
                        7216016)  and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Bhalla, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Bhalla, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the Effective Date.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Bhalla, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Bhalla, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (7)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Bhalla, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (7)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (8)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Bhalla, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   One-on-one instruction in communications satisfactory to the
                              College, with an instructor selected by the College.  The
                              instruction may take place via videoconferencing technology; 
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Bhalla, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports where relevant, within one (1) month of completing it. I
                        acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole
                        discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional
                        Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Bhalla, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (9)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Bhalla, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (7)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").
                        I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  (b)   I, Dr. Bhalla, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Bhalla, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the
                        Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Bhalla, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (10)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Bhalla, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Bhalla, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Bhalla, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Bhalla, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Bhalla, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Bhalla, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr. Bhalla, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and
                   executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
                  
            (14)  I, Dr. Bhalla, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (15)  I, Dr. Bhalla, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (16)  I, Dr. Bhalla, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (17)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Bhalla, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Bhalla, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (17)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        College investigations were conducted into whether Dr. Bhalla
                        engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in
                        prescribing, the practice of family medicine. As a result of the
                        investigations:
                  
                              Dr. Bhalla will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months. 
                  
                              Dr. Bhalla will engage in professional education in
                              communications.
                  
                              Dr. Bhalla's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the
                              period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Bhalla, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the 
                        College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (18)  I, Dr. Bhalla, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (19)  I, Dr. Bhalla, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (20)  I, Dr. Bhalla, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: February 21, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Jaswinder Bhalla to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 21, 2019:

College investigations were conducted into whether Dr. Bhalla engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in prescribing, the practice of family medicine. As a result of the investigations:

Dr. Bhalla will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.

Dr. Bhalla will engage in professional education in communications.

Dr. Bhalla's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 21, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 21, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)