skip to content

Bhalla, Indu Bala

CPSO#: 28055

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Delhi, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit 28 Eugene St Toronto, ON M6B 3Z4 Phone: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 30 May 2018


Address: Written requests for medical records for patients seen at the Med Care Parkways West Clinic, formerly located on Central Parkway West in Mississauga, should be sent to: MCI Medical Clinics Suite 200 160 Eglinton Avenue East Toronto, ON M4P 3B5
Date Received: 15 Jan 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018