skip to content

Beyani Mulaisho, Nambizi Namuya

CPSO#: 87610

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Aug 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 07 Oct 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Zambia, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
555 Prince Charles Drive North
Welland ON  L3C 6B5
Phone: (905) 732-1118
Fax: (905) 732-1119 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nambizi Beyani Mulaisho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mulaisho ( CPSO# 64320 )
Dr. N. Beyani Mulaisho ( CPSO# 87610 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
555 Prince Charles Drive North
Welland ON  L3C 6B5
Phone Number: (905) 732-1118

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2021
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 07 Oct 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 07 Oct 2021 Active
 As from October 7, 2021, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Nambizi Namuya Beyani Mulaisho  in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Beyani Mulaisho to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. NAMBIZI NAMUYA BEYANI MULAISHO
("Dr. Beyani")

to 

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")

A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 

"Discipline Tribunal" means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

"NMS" means the Narcotics Monitoring System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal" means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;	

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public. 

(2)	I, Dr. Beyani, certificate of registration number 87610, am a member of the College.  

(3)	I, Dr. Beyani, acknowledge that the College has received information regarding my infection prevention and control practices and that the College is conducting an investigation, bearing File Number CAS-130747-W7R3R0, into the information. I am aware of the College's concern about protecting the public.

(4)	I, Dr. Beyani, acknowledge that the College has accepted this Undertaking in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at this time.

(5)	I, Dr. Beyani, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the ICR Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with the Code.

(6)	I, Dr. Beyani, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force until the matters currently being investigated are disposed of by a panel of the ICR Committee or the Discipline Tribunal.

B.	UNDERTAKING

(7)	I, Dr. Beyani, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(8)	Compliance with Public Health Recommendations and Orders

(a)	I, Dr. Beyani, undertake to comply with all recommendations and orders made to me regarding my practice by Public Health Ontario and/or by the Niagara Region Public Health - Welland Office.

(9)	Practice Restriction

(a)	I, Dr. Beyani, shall use only single-use, disposable speculums for any patient encounter requiring a speculum.

(10)	Clinical Supervision 

(a)	I, Dr. Beyani, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), ("Clinical Supervision").

(b)	I, Dr. Beyani, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 

(i)	Facilitate the education program set out in the Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as Appendix "B"

(ii)	Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved by the College, once every two (2) weeks;

(iii)	Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every meeting, which shall be selected by the Clinical Supervisor independent of my participation, on the basis of the areas of concern identified in the materials received by the College, and any concerns that arise during the period of Clinical Supervision;

(iv)	Observe at least three (3) patient encounters at every meeting, including pre- and post-appointment infection prevention and control practices and clinical instrument usage;

(v)	Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews and observations;

(vi)	Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical Supervision; and

(vii)	Submit written reports to the College at least once every month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.

(c)	I, Dr. Beyani, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the areas of concern identified in the materials received by the College, and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.

(d)	I, Dr. Beyani, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional development.

(e)	I, Dr. Beyani, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.

(f)	I, Dr. Beyani, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.

(g)	I, Dr. Beyani, acknowledge that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (10)(e) and/or (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  

(h)	I, Dr. Beyani, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as a result of section (10)(g) above this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on my Certificate of Registration and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public register.

(11)	Professional Education

(a)	I, Dr. Beyani, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", including all aspects of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):

(i)	Infection Prevention and Control Core Competencies Online Learning Course, Public Health Ontario; 

(ii)	Review, reflection, and discussion with my Clinical Supervisor of Infection Prevention and Control for Clinical Office Practice Document, Provincial Infectious Diseases Advisory Committee (PIDAC); and

(iii)	Any additional education recommended by my Clinical Supervisor.

(b)	I, Dr. Beyani, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c)	I, Dr. Beyani, undertake to complete this requirement within one month of the date I execute this Undertaking, or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first available opportunity thereafter.

(d)	I, Dr. Beyani, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

(e)	I, Dr. Beyani, acknowledge that if any of the programs listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.

(12)	I, Dr. Beyani, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice, delegate, or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(13)	I, Dr. Beyani, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(14)	I, Dr. Beyani, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal.

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(15)	I, Dr. Beyani, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(16)	I, Dr. Beyani, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(17)	I, Dr. Beyani, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(18)	I, Dr. Beyani, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").	

(19)	I, Dr. Beyani, acknowledge that, in the event of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal and in the event of an appeal of any Order of the Discipline Tribunal, if the Discipline Tribunal has directed the Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my certificate of registration, that Order will take effect immediately despite any appeal.

(20)	I, Dr. Beyani, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

(21)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Beyani, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. Beyani, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (19)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

The College has received information regarding Dr. Beyani's infection prevention and control practices and is conducting an investigation into the information. During the investigation and in the event of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal: 

Dr. Beyani must comply with Orders and recommendations issued by Public Health Ontario.

Dr. Beyani must only use single-use disposable speculums for any patient encounter requiring a speculum.

Dr. Beyani must practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College. 

Dr. Beyani will engage in professional education in infection prevention and control.

D.	CONSENT

(22)	I, Dr. Beyani, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, the Drug Program Services Branch, Public Health Ontario and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(23)	I, Dr. Beyani, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "C". 

(24)	I, Dr. Beyani, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to all Clinical Supervisors:

(a)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and 

(c)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(25)	I, Dr. Beyani, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(26)	I, Dr. Beyani, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors and Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a)	any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b)	any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A"; 

(c)	any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking. 


Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 7, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Beyani Mulaisho to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 7, 2021:

The College has received information regarding Dr. Beyani’s infection prevention and control practices and is conducting an investigation into the information. During the investigation and in the event of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal:

Dr. Beyani must comply with Orders and recommendations issued by Public Health Ontario.

Dr. Beyani must only use single-use disposable speculums for any patient encounter requiring a speculum.

Dr. Beyani must practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.

Dr. Beyani will engage in professional education in infection prevention and control.