Bevan, Rachel Bronwen (CPSO#: 98577)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3090 Col Talbot Rd
Unit 2
London ON  N6P 0B3
Phone: 519-473-4394
Fax: 519-472-5904
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rachel Bevan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bevan ( CPSO# 98577 )

Business Address:
2-3090 Colonel Talbot Road
London ON  N6P 0B3
Phone Number: (519) 473-4394

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHEL BRONWEN BEVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEVAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2014