skip to content

Betts, Martin Edward

CPSO#: 88774

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Health Network
General Site
Critical Care Unit
3050 Lawerence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-3434
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Centre for Sleep and Chronobiology
295 College Street, Suite 301
Toronto ON  M5T 1S2
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-9531
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Cobourg Sleep Clinic
197 Third Street
Cobourg ON  K9A 3L5
Canada
Phone: 905-373-1227
Fax: 905-373-4062
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Site
Intensive Care Unit
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Scarborough Health Network
Birchmount Site
Intensive Care Unit
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2626
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Vaughan Sleep Clinic
200 Windflower Gate
Unit AA5
Vaughan ON  L4L 9K8
Canada
Phone: (905) 856-1300
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Martin Betts Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Betts ( CPSO# 88774 )

Business Address:
301 - 295 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1S2
Phone Number: (416) 603-9531

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
Vaughan Sleep Disorders Clinic
AA5-200 Windflower Gate
Vaughan ON  L4L 9K8
Phone Number: (905) 856-1300

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2626

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
197 Third Street
Cobourg ON  K9A 3L5
Phone Number: (905) 373-1227

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:29 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARTIN EDWARD BETTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BETTS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012