skip to content

Bethell, Walter Hiltz

CPSO#: 26942

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Records for former patients of Dr. Walter H. Bethell's practise have been transferred to Dr. Bonnie Weston (#58303). All requests of this nature should be directed to Dr. Bonnie Weston (#58303).
Date Received: 25 Feb 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:25 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008