skip to content

Beswick, Melanie Brooke

CPSO#: 98081

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queens Quay Medical
10 Lower Jarvis Street
Toronto ON  M5E 1Z2
Phone: (647) 827-9200
Fax: (647) 827-9202 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Zochowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Beswick ( CPSO# 98081 )
Dr. T. Zochowski ( CPSO# 98487 )

Business Address:
3075 Hospital Gate
Suite 203
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1

Business Address:
Queens Quay Medical
10 Lower Jarvis Street
Toronto ON  M5E 1Z2
Phone Number: (647) 827-9200

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELANIE BROOKE BESWICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BESWICK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2014