skip to content

Awad, Beshoy Samir

CPSO#: 117032

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Sep 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MCI The Doctor's Office
700 - 200 Windflower Gate
Woodbridge ON  L4L 9L3
Phone: (905) 856-2100 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

14872 Yonge St
Aurora ON  L4G 1N2
Canada
Phone: (905) 505-0950
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Suite 115
150 Wynford Heights Crescent
Toronto ON  M3C 1K7
Canada
Phone: (416) 519-1377
Fax: (647) 340-7779
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: B. Awad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Awad ( CPSO# 117032)

Business Address:
115-150 Wynford Dr
North York ON  M3C 1K6

Business Address:
14872 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1N2
Phone Number: (905) 505-0950

Business Address:
10660 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C9
Phone Number: (905) 770-9096


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:05 Jul 2019 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BESHOY SAMIR AWAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AWAD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Oct 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Apr 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Sep 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2019