skip to content

Berube, Marie-Eve

CPSO#: 98371

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
225 Donald Street, Unit 120
Ottawa ON  K1K 1N1
Phone: 613-745-2228
Fax: 613-745-9520 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

B1060 - 801 Aviation drive
Ottawa ON  K1K 4R3
Canada
Phone: 613-742-2493 Ext. 2067
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal road
Orléans ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: 613-746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Marie-Eve Berube Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Berube ( CPSO# 98371 )

Business Address:
120-225 Donald St
Ottawa ON  K1K 1N1
Phone Number: 613-745-2228

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
Suite B 1060
801 Aviation Parkway
Ottawa ON  K1K 4R3
Phone Number: (613) 742-4293

Business Address:
Suite 104
4275 Innes
Orleans ON  K1C 1T1
Phone Number: (613) 424-6343

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIE-EVE BERUBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERUBE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014