skip to content

Berube, Joel Michel

CPSO#: 86614

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014