Berube, Guillaume (CPSO#: 99833)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Montreal, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Feb 2013 to 10 Mar 2013
Elective Trainee - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016