skip to content

Bertok, Larissa

CPSO#: 89798

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Dec 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Trieste, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2008 to 15 Sep 2008
PEAP - R - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 16 Sep 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
EL - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2009