Bernstein, Erica Anne (CPSO#: 98803)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 24 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERICA ANNE BERNSTEIN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BERNSTEIN is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. BERNSTEIN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BERNSTEIN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BERNSTEIN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BERNSTEIN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BERNSTEIN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 20 Jul 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019