Berndl, Anne Maria Lefebvre (CPSO#: 96840)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Nov 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite M4136
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4920
Fax: (416) 480-4933
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anne Maria Lefebvre Berndl Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Berndl ( CPSO# 96840 )

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite M4136
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4329

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 22 Nov 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE MARIA LEFEBVRE BERNDL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERNDL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 26 Sep 2011 to 22 Nov 2011
Elective Trainee - Maternal Fetal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2013 to 11 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

McMaster University, 12 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

McMaster University, 04 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 13 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2011