skip to content

Bernardi, Jaclyn Christine

CPSO#: 88901

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Oct 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
640 Ross Avenue East
Suite E
Timmins ON  P4N 0A2
Phone: (705) 531-3267
Fax: (705) 531-3269 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jaclyn Bernardi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bernardi ( CPSO# 88901 )

Business Address:
Timmins and District Hospital
E - 640 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8A2
Phone Number: (705) 531-3268

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:12 Aug 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JACLYN CHRISTINE BERNARDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERNARDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 01 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 02 Sep 2010 to 01 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 02 Sep 2011 to 01 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 02 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2013