skip to content

Bernard, Afiya Jamila

CPSO#: 85776

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Dec 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Heath System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: 9054942120 Ext. 57337
Fax: 9054946563 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: 905-494-2120 Ext. 57337
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Afiya Bernard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bernard ( CPSO# 85776 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:13 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AFIYA JAMILA BERNARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERNARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 20 Nov 2006 to 17 Dec 2006
EL - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2007