skip to content

Bergman, Jacobus Johannes Gerardus Hendrikus Maria

CPSO#: 89970

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Oct 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Oct 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:State University of Utrecht, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2018