skip to content

Bergeron, Sheri Lyn

CPSO#: 92792

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospice of Windsor and Essex County
6038 Empress Street
Windsor ON  N8T 1B5
Phone: (519) 974-7100
Fax: (519) 974-7672 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: 5192545577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

6-90 Shuter st
Toronto ON  M5B2K6
Canada
Phone: (647) 348-4490
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sheri L. Bergeron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bergeron ( CPSO# 92792 )

Business Address:
Hospice of Windsor and Essex County
6038 Empress Street
Windsor ON  N8T 1B5
Phone Number: (519) 974-7100

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 551-9849

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Palliative Medicine Effective:25 Sep 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHERI LYN BERGERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERGERON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012