skip to content

Berger, Warren

CPSO#: 98305

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6-627 Maitland Street
London ON  N5Y2V7
Phone: 2267218800
Fax: 5199630588 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: W. Berger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Berger ( CPSO# 98305 )

Business Address:
Suite 6
627 Maitland Street
London ON  N5Y 2V7
Phone Number: (519) 601-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WARREN BERGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2018